Fujii, Hisaki (CPSO#: 92115)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Nihon Daigaku Igakubu, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2009 to 06 Dec 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

University of Toronto, 07 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015