Fuller, Colleen Meghan (CPSO#: 95699)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kateri Memorial Hospital Centre
10 River Road
Kahnawa:ke QC  J0L1B0
Phone: 450-638-3930
Fax: 450-638-4634
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

125 King Street Box 329
Thedford ON  N0M 2N0
Canada
Phone: (519) 296-5807
Fax: (519) 296-4887
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

Atikokan General Hospital
120 Dorothy Street
Atikokan ON  P0T1C0
Canada
Phone: 8075974215
County: District of Rainy River
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Colleen Fuller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Fuller ( CPSO# 95699 )

Business Address:
Atikokan General Hospital
120 Dorothy Street
Atikokan ON  P0T 1C0

Business Address:
125 King Street
Box 329
Thedford ON  N0M 2N0

Business Address:
Kateri Memorial Hospital Centre
P O Box 10
10 River Road
Kahnawake QC  J0L 1B0
Phone Number: (450) 638-3930

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 28 Aug 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLLEEN MEGHAN FULLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FULLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 18 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2013