Fuller, Donald Matthew (CPSO#: 60906)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
461 Dundas St
Woodstock ON  N4S 1C2
Phone: (519) 421-9557
Fax: (519) 421-9561
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Clinic 528
528 Dundas Street
London ON  N8B 1W6
Canada
Phone: (519) 645-1533
Fax: (519) 645-1556
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Donald M. Fuller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fuller ( CPSO# 60906 )

Business Address:
461 Dundas Street
Woodstock ON  N4S 1C2
Phone Number: (519) 421-9557

Business Address:
528 Dundas Street
London ON  N6B 1W6
Phone Number: (519) 645-1533


Corporation Name: Dr. Donald Fuller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fuller ( CPSO# 60906 )

Business Address:
461 Dundas Street
London ON  L4S 1C2
Phone Number: (519) 421-9557

Business Address:
528 Dundas Street East
London ON  N6B 1W6
Phone Number: (519) 645-1533

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD MATTHEW FULLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FULLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 May 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1990