Fung, Leslie Caesar (CPSO#: 75042)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jan 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Albany Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

MyHealth
2575 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 1L5
Canada
Phone: (416) 690-9437
Fax: (416) 690-9441
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

C378
Sunnybrook Health Sciences
Toronto ON  M4N3M5
Canada
Phone: 416-480-6115
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010


Corporation Name: Dr. Leslie Fung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 14 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLIE CAESAR FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Nov 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jan 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2006