Fung, Michelle Anne (CPSO#: 72756)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 717
115 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 0A9
Phone: 416-741-3111
Fax: 416-741-0654
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Fung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fung ( CPSO# 72756 )

Business Address:
717-115 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 0A9
Phone Number: (416) 741-3111

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE ANNE FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2014