Fung, Scott (CPSO#: 72702)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Room 9 - EN 230
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3893
Fax: (416) 340-3258
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott Fung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fung ( CPSO# 72702 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Room 9 - EN 230
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3893

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 25 Oct 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002