Fuoco, Michael Benjamin (CPSO#: 92964)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
38 Water Street E
Brockville ON  K6V 1A2
Phone: 613-342-5668
Fax: 613-345-1568
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

75 Charles St
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Canada
Phone: 613-345-5645
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fuoco Yule Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yule ( CPSO# 93215 )
Dr. M. Fuoco ( CPSO# 92964 )

Business Address:
38 Water Street East
Brockville ON  K6V 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 342-5668

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5645

Business Address:
135 Ormond Street
Brockville ON  K6B 1T6
Phone Number: (613) 342-8176

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL BENJAMIN FUOCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUOCO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015