Furlan, Andrea Dompieri (CPSO#: 85696)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Oct 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Sao Paulo, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
University Centre
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 4607
Fax: (416) 597-7074
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 01 Oct 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Oct 2006 to 07 Jan 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 08 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jan 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2014 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Andrea Dompieri Furlan may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of  Physiatry  at the University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Furlan  holds an academic appointment  at  the  rank  of  Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires when Dr. Furlan no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.