Furmli, Suleiman (CPSO#: 106505)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Town Care Medical Clinic
3 - 60 Town Centre Court
Scarborough ON  M1P 0B1
Phone: (416) 792-2654
Fax: (416) 792-4786
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Center for Physical Health
201 - 300 Rossland Rd
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

600 Sherbourne St.
Suite 202
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Canada
Phone: 647-748-7414
Fax: 647-748-7424
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Furmli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Furmli ( CPSO# 106505)

Business Address:
Town Care Medical Clinic
Suite 3
60 Town Centre Court
Toronto ON  M1P 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 792-2654

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Aug 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SULEIMAN FURMLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FURMLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2017