Fusch, Christoph (CPSO#: 89436)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:Eberhard Karls University at Tubingen, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Fusch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Jul 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2016