Saab, George (CPSO#: 81104)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department of Radiology
PO Box 1800
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George Saab Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Saab ( CPSO# 81104 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department of Radiology
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121


Corporation Name: Dr.'s Thomson, Howlett, Hawkes, Rosta, Saab, Baldauf, Greaves & McIver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Drover ( CPSO# 82776 )
Dr. N. Rosta ( CPSO# 67897 )
Dr. S. Thomson ( CPSO# 57552 )
Dr. F. Greaves ( CPSO# 31954 )
Dr. C. McIver ( CPSO# 31778 )
Dr. G. Saab ( CPSO# 81104 )
Dr. C. Baldauf ( CPSO# 72518 )
Dr. R. Hawkes ( CPSO# 77933 )
Dr. L. Howlett ( CPSO# 68288 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Business Address:
Owen Sound Medical Centre
Suite 3600
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone Number: (519) 376-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE SAAB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAAB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009