Gabrail, Yousry Abdel-Karim Tawfik (CPSO#: 88614)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bronte Medical Group
78 Jones Street
Oakville ON  L6L 6C5
Phone: (905) 827-9865
Fax: (905) 827-3583
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Huron Square Medical Centre
2500 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 1N4
Canada
Phone: (905) 897-6160
Fax: (905) 897-6729
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yousry Gabrail Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Gabrail ( CPSO# 88614 )

Business Address:
Bronte Medical Group
78 Jones Street
Oakville ON  L6L 6C5
Phone Number: (905) 827-9865

Business Address:
Huron Square Medical Centre
2500 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 1N4
Phone Number: (905) 879-6160

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YOUSRY ABDEL-KARIM TAWFIK GABRAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GABRAIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010