Gabril, Manal Youssef (CPSO#: 86020)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Mar 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Minya, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus Site
Department of Pathology
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manal Gabril Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gabril ( CPSO# 86020 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Campus Site
Department of Pathology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANAL YOUSSEF GABRIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GABRIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2007 to 01 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2007