Gafni, Inbal (CPSO#: 80726)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
7th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Phone: (416) 323-6400
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Nicotine Dependence Clinic, CAMH
175 College Street
Toronto ON  M5S 3E3
Canada
Phone: (416) 535-8501
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Agrawal & Gafni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Gafni ( CPSO# 80726 )
Dr. S. Agrawal ( CPSO# 77900 )

Business Address:
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
7th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Nov 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. INBAL GAFNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAFNI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2006 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2007 to 30 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 16 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2010