Gagarine, Andrei Evgenievich (CPSO#: 79990)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Izevsk State Medical Academy, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Anaesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46698
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrei Gagarine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gagarine ( CPSO# 79990 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Anaesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREI EVGENIEVICH GAGARINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAGARINE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Aug 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011