Gagnon, Antoine (CPSO#: 80767)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3192 Logan Farm Drive
Osgoode ON  K0A 2W0
Phone: (613) 826-2502
Fax: (613) 826-1682
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Gagnon Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gagnon ( CPSO# 80767 )

Business Address:
3192 Logan Farm Drive
Osgoode ON  K0A 2W0
Phone Number: (613) 826-2502

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTOINE GAGNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAGNON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006