Gagnon, Louise-Helene (CPSO#: 91328)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue, Suite B725
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5845
Fax: (416) 754-0244
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L.H. Gagnon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gagnon ( CPSO# 91328 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room B725
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5845

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUISE-HELENE GAGNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAGNON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2016