Gagnon, Sophie (CPSO#: 76625)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 May 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 May 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Laval University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 May 2002