Gaisinsky, Igor (CPSO#: 78226)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1568 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 1K7
Phone: (519) 256-4914
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-4412
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Igor Gaisinsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Gaisinsky ( CPSO# 78226 )

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
1568 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 1K7
Phone Number: (519) 256-4914

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IGOR GAISINSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAISINSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 01 Nov 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002