Galal, Ahmed (CPSO#: 73471)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Ain Shams University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Duke University
2400 Pratt Street
Suite 9000
Durham NC  27705
United States
Phone: 919-684-8964
Fax: 919-684-5325

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - North Carolina

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 25 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMED GALAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2000