Gale, Jenna (CPSO#: 95976)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Fertility Centre
955 Green Valley Crescent #100
Ottawa ON  K2C3V4
Phone: 6136863378
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 03 Apr 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNA GALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 04 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Ottawa, 19 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2017