Galinski, Saramin Elizabeth (CPSO#: 73732)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T8
Phone: (519) 426-0130 Ext. 2205
Fax: (519) 429-6899
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

50 Charlton Ave. E
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: 905 522 1155 Ext. 33853
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

726 Upper James
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Canada
Phone: 905 575 5743
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

ON-105
Redlake
Red Lake ON  P0V 2M0
Canada
Phone: 807-727-2617
Fax: 8666651639
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saramin Elizabeth Galinski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Galinski ( CPSO# 73732 )

Business Address:
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T8
Phone Number: (519) 426-0130

Business Address:
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 575-5743

Business Address:
105 Redlake Highway
Red Lake ON  P0V 2M0
Phone Number: (807) 727-2617

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAMIN ELIZABETH GALINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALINSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004