Galipeau, Joseph Daniel Francois Jocelyn (CPSO#: 53620)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Box 554 Callander ON P0H 1H0
Date Received: 30 May 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Mar 1999
Summary:

In March 23, 1999,  Dr. Galipeau pleaded guilty and was found guilty of professional 
misconduct in that he had been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to 
practise as defined in paragraph 51(1)(a) of Health Professions Procedural Code and that he 
performed an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
unprofessional, as defined in paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856, R.O. 1993. 
 
Having heard the evidence presented and submissions of counsel for the College of Physicians 
and Surgeons of Ontario and of counsel for Dr. Galipeau, the Discipline Committee of the 
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario makes the following order as to penalty: 
 
1.    Dr. Galipeau shall be required to attend before a panel of the Discipline Committee to be 
      reprimanded. 
 
2.    The Registrar of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario shall be directed to 
      suspend Dr. Galipeau s Certificate of Registration for a period of twelve months.   This 
      suspension shall itself be suspended provided that Dr. Galipeau complies with the 
      following conditions: 
             
      (a)   he will continue the practice of medicine in Smooth Rock Falls, or such other 
            underserviced area as may be approved by the Discipline Committee, for a period 
            of 24 months; 
 
      (b)   he will make a donation of $35,000 in each of the next two years from the date of 
            this Order to the Smooth Rock Falls Hospital.   He shall provide proof satisfactory 
            to the Registrar, of the first payment within twelve months of the date of this order 
            and  of the second payment within twenty-four months of the date of this Order.  
       
      (c)   Dr. Galipeau will provide an undertaking satisfactory to the Registrar  that he will 
            not in future hold any financial or ownership interest in a home for senior citizens, 
              nursing home, other residential facility, or Independent Health Facility  in 
            which he is performing medical services and that he will not provide medical 
            services in any such facility in which there is a financial or ownership interest by a 
            family member.  
 
      (d)   Dr. Galipeau will successfully complete an ethics course, with a focus on conflict 
            of interest, to be arranged by the Department of Professional Enhancement of the 
            College, at his own expense, within the next twelve months. 
 
3.    In the event of non-compliance with any of the conditions imposed in paragraph 2, as 
      determined by the Registrar, Dr. Galipeau will be required to serve the twelve month 
      suspension, to commence on a date to be fixed by the Registrar.  However, in the event 
      of a disagreement between Dr. Galipeau and the College with regard to compliance, the 
      decision on this issue will be made by the Discipline Committee. 
 
                      
                      

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Mar 22, 1999