Galle, Jennifer Laura (CPSO#: 96087)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Richmond Hill Children's Clinic
404-250 Harding Blvd
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone: 905-737-9898
Fax: 905-737-8583
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: 905-472-7534
Fax: 905-472-7535
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Peel Memorial Hospital
20 Lynch St
Brampton ON  L6W2Z8
Canada
Phone: (905) 863-2552
Fax: (905) 863-2468
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LAURA GALLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2016