Gallego, Patricia Herold (CPSO#: 94828)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Feb 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Federal Do Parana, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8138
Fax: (519) 685-8105
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jul 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Feb 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Feb 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jan 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Patricia Herold Gallego may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  Division  of   Endocrinology,  University  of Western
                        Ontario, in which Dr. Gallego holds an academic appointment  at the
                        rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Gallego no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.