Gallow, Mark Douglas (CPSO#: 80239)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Sep 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Roseland After Hours Medical Clinic
3840 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N9E 3N9
Phone: 519 972 3944
Fax: 519 969 4478
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Gallow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gallow ( CPSO# 80239 )

Business Address:
Roseland After hours Medical Clinic
3840 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N9E 3N9
Phone Number: (519) 972-3944

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 May 2014 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Sep 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Sep 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 Jan 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2009 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Mark Douglas Gallow may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
            only.