Galvin, Imelda Margaret (CPSO#: 91553)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 2012

Expiry Date:  19 Aug 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Aug 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
and Perioperative Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 533-2952
Fax: (613) 548-6042
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Erb ( CPSO# 79144 )
Dr. M. Fleming ( CPSO# 71251 )
Dr. I. Gilron ( CPSO# 62229 )
Dr. S. Haley ( CPSO# 50665 )
Dr. R. Henry ( CPSO# 63132 )
Dr. A. Ho ( CPSO# 52926 )
Dr. M. Jaeger ( CPSO# 64665 )
Dr. D. Mark ( CPSO# 59595 )
Dr. M. McMullen ( CPSO# 79939 )
Dr. J. Murdoch ( CPSO# 78475 )
Dr. J. Parlow ( CPSO# 53229 )
Dr. L. Patterson ( CPSO# 71791 )
Dr. C. Reimer ( CPSO# 79239 )
Dr. R. Rooney ( CPSO# 78503 )
Dr. T. Saha ( CPSO# 78692 )
Dr. V. Shyam ( CPSO# 81241 )
Dr. R. Tanzola ( CPSO# 76158 )
Dr. K. Turner ( CPSO# 55360 )
Dr. J. Van Vlymen ( CPSO# 62179 )
Dr. L. Wang ( CPSO# 59429 )
Dr. D. Sydor ( CPSO# 82811 )
Dr. C. Haley ( CPSO# 104664)
Dr. J. Dion ( CPSO# 88602 )
Dr. M. Kahn ( CPSO# 85650 )
Dr. D. Engen ( CPSO# 73829 )
Dr. S. Duggan ( CPSO# 72631 )
Dr. R. Allard ( CPSO# 85022 )
Dr. J. Burjorjee ( CPSO# 73521 )
Dr. M. Cummings ( CPSO# 71070 )
Dr. G. Sudhakaran Nair ( CPSO# 85923 )
Dr. S. Ridi ( CPSO# 84478 )
Dr. I. Galvin ( CPSO# 91553 )
Dr. A. Mir Ghassemi ( CPSO# 95204 )
Dr. G. Mizubuti ( CPSO# 101768)
Dr. G. Klar ( CPSO# 111507)

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Providence Continuing Care Centre
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101


Corporation Name: I. Galvin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Galvin ( CPSO# 91553 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
and Perioperative Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 533-2952

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Providence Care Centre
St. Mary's of the Lake
340 Union Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5A2
Phone Number: (613) 533-2952

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 20 Aug 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 18 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Aug 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Apr 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Imelda Margaret Galvin may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Anaesthesiology and Perioperative Medicine, Queen's University, in
                        which Dr. Galvin holds an academic appointment at the rank of
                        Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Galvin no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Galvin's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Galvin's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on August 20, 2012.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on August 19, 2019.