Gamache, Nathalie Danielle (CPSO#: 73541)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nathalie Gamache Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: PO Box 47014 Denman Place Mall Vancouver, BC V6G 3E1 drngamache@gmail.com
Date Received: 31 May 2018


Instructions: Patients seeking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact Dr. Gamache at: drngamache@gmail.com.
Date Received: 12 Sep 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 15 Aug 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 20 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 21 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 20 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018