Gambarotta, Nicola (CPSO#: 84219)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: (800) 483-2811
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

QHC Prince Edward County Memorial H
403 Main Street East P.O. Box 1900
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Canada
Phone: (613) 476-1008
County: County of Prince Edward
Electoral District: 06

1-H Manor Lane
P.O. Box 157
Bancroft, Ontario
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Canada
Phone: (613) 332-2825
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

242 King Street
Trenton, Ontario
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Canada
Phone: (613) 392-2540
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

8 Richmond Park Dr, Greater Napanee
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Canada
Phone: (613) 354-3301
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Webb Gambarotta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gambarotta ( CPSO# 84219 )
Dr. K. Webb ( CPSO# 84399 )

Business Address:
Queen's University
Department of Family Medicine
115 Clarence Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-9303

Business Address:
Cataraqui Urgent Care Centre
945 Gardiners Road
Kingston ON  K7M 7H4
Phone Number: (613) 389-3348

Business Address:
QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
Queens University
Dept. of Medicine
18 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2544

Business Address:
Medical Council of Canada
100 - 2283 St. Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1G 5A2
Phone Number: (613) 520-2240

Business Address:
Lennox & Addington County General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 Jul 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLA GAMBAROTTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAMBAROTTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 08 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 09 Dec 2008 to 02 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 03 Nov 2009 to 02 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 03 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2011