Gan, Bing Siang (CPSO#: 63013)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, German, Indonesian

Education:Erasmus University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Roth | McFarlane
Hand and Upper Limb Centre
St. Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6097
Fax: (519) 646-6049
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Gan ( CPSO# 63013 )
Dr. P. Langer ( CPSO# 62079 )

Business Address:
Hand and Upper Limb Centre
St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
Suite D1-213
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 646-6097

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Netherlands

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BING SIANG GAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1992