Gan, Runye (CPSO#: 95065)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 19 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 06 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 19 Aug 2011
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Aug 2011