Ganapathy, Anusoumya (CPSO#: 93949)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Tamil

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 837-6440
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anusoumya Ganapathy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ganapathy ( CPSO# 93949 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2018 to 30 Dec 2018
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 May 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 28 May 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Anusoumya  Ganapathy  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  internal
            medicine and critical care medicine, only.