Gandhi, Jasmine (CPSO#: 73828)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital-General Campus
Department of Psychiatry
4th Floor
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8010
Fax: (613) 737-8115
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Gandhi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 31 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 Apr 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASMINE GANDHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANDHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2005