Gandhi, Shruti (CPSO#: 61933)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Delhi, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Malton Medical Group,
201-6870 Goreway Drive
Mississauga ON  L4V 1P1
Phone: (905) 677-4200
Fax: (905) 677-0541
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CRYSTAL CLINIC, 106-1620 Albion Rd.
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B4
Canada
Phone: 647-616-8300
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

CRYSTAL CLINIC,
106-1620 Albion Road
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B4
Canada
Phone: 647-616-8300
Fax: 416-233-8355
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

CRYSTAL CLINIC,
106-1620 Albion Road
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B4
Canada
Phone: 647-616-8300
Fax: 416-233-8355
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shruti Gandhi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gandhi ( CPSO# 61933 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
101 Westmore Drive
Toronto ON  M9V 3Y6
Phone Number: (416) 748-2800

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Business Address:
The Create IVF Program Inc.
1100 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 323-7727

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Biochemistry Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHRUTI GANDHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANDHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1994