Gandhi, Sonal (CPSO#: 82609)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Oncology
2075 Bayview Avenue
T2-037
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 4617
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sonal Gandhi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gandhi ( CPSO# 82609 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Oncology
Unit T2-037 2075 Bayview Avenue
T Wing 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SONAL GANDHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANDHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1908 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009