Gandhi, Sumeet (CPSO#: 95766)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4L8
Phone: 905 521 2100 Ext. 44160
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sumeet Gandhi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gandhi ( CPSO# 95766 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUMEET GANDHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANDHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015