Gandilo, Christina Nadia (CPSO#: 94562)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sydney, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
404-1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1V3
Phone: (613) 728-1392
Fax: (613) 728-4062
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1194 Evans Ave
Ottawa ON  K1H 7Z4
Canada
Phone: (613) 521-0999
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christina N. Gandilo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gandilo ( CPSO# 94562 )
Dr. M. Daryawish ( CPSO# 25415 )

Business Address:
404 - 1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone Number: (613) 728-1392

Business Address:
1194 Evans Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1H 7Z4
Phone Number: (613) 521-0999

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA NADIA GANDILO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANDILO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2011