Ganeshalingam, Anushiya (CPSO#: 93064)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Platinum Medical Clinic
3170 Eglinton Ave E
Toronto ON  M1J 2H3
Phone: (416) 265-2255
Fax: (416) 265-6737
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Heritage Clinic
5970 16th Ave Unit #128
Markham ON  L3P 7R1
Canada
Phone: (905) 471-2967
Fax: (905) 471-0476
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anushiya Ganeshalingam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ganeshalingam ( CPSO# 93064 )

Business Address:
Platinum Medical Clinic
3170 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1J 2H3
Phone Number: (416) 265-2255

Business Address:
Markham Heritage Clinic
Suite 128
5970 16th Avenue
Markham ON  L3P 7R1
Phone Number: (905) 471-2967

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANUSHIYA GANESHALINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANESHALINGAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2012