Ganeshamoorthy, Ambika (CPSO#: 95129)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Pennsylvania State University Coll of Me, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wise Elephant Family Health Team
Suite 4
2 Kennedy Road S
Brampton ON  L6W 3E1
Phone: (289) 323-0600
Fax: (289) 298-5022
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Peel Public Health
325 Central Parkway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3X9
Canada
Phone: 905-270-0587
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Peel Memorial Hospital
20 Lynch Street
Brampton, ON
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ambika Ganeshamoorthy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ganeshamoorthy ( CPSO# 95129 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
325 Central Parkway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3X9
Phone Number: (905) 270-0587

Business Address:
4 - 2 Kennedy Road South
Brampton ON  L6W 3E1
Phone Number: (289) 323-0660

Business Address:
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2X8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMBIKA GANESHAMOORTHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANESHAMOORTHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2015 to 03 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014