Ganga Raju, Arvind Raju (CPSO#: 94774)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Otago, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2011 to 04 Apr 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 05 Apr 2011 to 31 Jan 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jan 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2012