Gangasandra Basavaraj, Ashok (CPSO#: 97171)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Mysore University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 09 Feb 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 10 Feb 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2013