Gangdev, Prakash Shantilal (CPSO#: 83690)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Sep 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Bombay, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
315 Wharncliffe Rd S
London ON  N6J 2L6
Phone: (519) 933-3067
Fax: 519 672 6886
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

23 Huron St. West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Canada
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Prakash Gangdev Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Gangdev ( CPSO# 83690 )

Business Address:
23 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone Number: (519) 235-3343

Business Address:
315 Wharncliffe Road South
London ON  N6J 2L6
Phone Number: (519) 933-3067

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Sep 2005 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Feb 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Prakash   Shantilal   Gangdev  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            Psychiatry, only.