Gannon, Brian Robert (CPSO#: 77848)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Pathology
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN ROBERT GANNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANNON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2007