Gannon, Kathleen Elizabeth (CPSO#: 90071)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
440 Central Avenue, Suite 701
London ON  N6B 2E9
Phone: (519) 601-7577
Fax: (519) 601-7737
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gannon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gannon ( CPSO# 90071 )

Business Address:
701 - 440 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E5
Phone Number: (519) 601-7577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHLEEN ELIZABETH GANNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANNON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Dec 2008 to 13 Jan 2009
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2009