Garady, Cherif Issa (CPSO#: 85275)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Khartoum, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2012