Garani, Osama Haider (CPSO#: 83253)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4056 Dorchester Road
Unit 200
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6M9
Canada
Phone: (905) 228-9955
Fax: (905) 228-0990
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Osama Garani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Garani ( CPSO# 83253 )

Business Address:
200 - 4056 Dorchester Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6M9
Phone Number: (905) 228-9955

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OSAMA HAIDER GARANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 29 Jul 2005
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 30 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 13 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2015