Garavaglia, Marco Maria (CPSO#: 92152)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2013

Expiry Date:  31 Dec 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jan 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:Univ degli Studi del Piemonte Orientale, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Dept of Anaesthesia and Pain
Room MCL 2-405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5118
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville St, Toronto
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: 416-323-6269
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Garavaglia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Garavaglia ( CPSO# 92152 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia and Pain
Room MCL2-405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5118

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Italy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 17 Nov 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 18 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2013
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jan 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Marco Maria Garavaglia may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Anaesthesia,  University  of Toronto, in which Dr. Garavaglia holds
                        an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  seven  years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Garavaglia  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report  indicating that Dr. Garavaglia's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does not receive an annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when  the  Committee   makes  a  decision  about  Dr.  Garavaglia's
                        certificate  of  registration,   following   consideration  of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  January  1, 2013.  In accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will,  if  not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on December 31, 2019.