Garay, Michael Elliott (CPSO#: 72230)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen Square Doctors
Unit 201
366 Main Street North
Brampton ON  L6V 1P8
Phone: (905) 455-1455
Fax: (905) 455-5498
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Garay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Garay ( CPSO# 72230 )

Business Address:
Queen Square Doctors
Suite 201
366 Main Street North
Brampton ON  L6V 1P8
Phone Number: (905) 455-5477

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ELLIOTT GARAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000