Garber, Adam Benjamin (CPSO#: 93590)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
152 Cleopatra Drive, Suite 106
Ottawa, Ontario
Ottawa ON  K2G5X2
Phone: (613)224-6060
Fax: (613)722-1310
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Garber Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Garber ( CPSO# 93590 )

Business Address:
152 Cleopatra Drive
Suite 106
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Phone Number: (613) 224-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM BENJAMIN GARBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARBER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015