Garcia Bournissen, Facundo (CPSO#: 83236)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 08 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2011